WebThe Deputy Director of the Central Intelligence Agency (DD/CIA) is a statutory office ... George W. Bush Barack Obama: Michael Morell: May 7, 2010 – August 9, 2013 Barack Obama Avril Haines: August 9, 2013 – January 10, 2015 David S. Cohen: February 9, 2015 – January 20, 2024 WebGeorge H.W. Bush’s tenure as Director of Central Intelligence (DCI) marked a turning point for the Agency as it came out of a period of great controversy. He is credited with …
Central Intelligence Agency - List of CIA directors Britannica
WebApr 4, 2024 · “The Bush School constantly strives to provide our students with an exceptional educational experience, not just in the classroom, but by drawing on the … WebAug 23, 2024 · Over the past week, retired U.S. Air Force Gen. and former Bush administration Central Intelligence Agency director Michael Hayden compared supporters of former President Donald Trump to the Taliban and backed a call to send unvaccinated Trump supporters to Afghanistan. On Thursday, Hayden retweeted a photo that … haw tree
Kirby Sommers on Twitter: "Anyone else notice that people who …
WebRobert Michael Gates (born September 25, 1943) is an American intelligence analyst and university president who served as the twenty-second United States secretary of defense from 2006 to 2011. He was originally appointed by President George W. Bush and was retained by President Barack Obama.Gates began his career serving as an officer in the … WebThe director of the Central Intelligence Agency would serve as chief administrator of the CIA. The reorganization took effect on April 21, 2005. The 19th and last DCI, Porter J. Goss … WebApr 26, 2007 · A former U.S. spy chief accused President George W. Bush's administration of ruining his reputation by ... Former CIA director George Tenet told CBS Television’s “60 Minutes” that the ... hawtree client portal